Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/29/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/29/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/29/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/29/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/31/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/31/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/31/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/31/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/05/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/05/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/07/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/07/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/07/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/07/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/07/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/12/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/12/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/12/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/14/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/04/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/04/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/04/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/04/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/06/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/26/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/03/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/16/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/16/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 06/16/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/07/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/18/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/18/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/22/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/26/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/15/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/24/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/06/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew