There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide the Quileute Indian Tribe Tsunami and Flood Protection, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2012Became Public Law No: 112-97. (TXT | PDF)
02/27/2012Signed by President.
02/16/2012Presented to President.
02/13/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S582)
02/06/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 7 (Roll no. 35).(text: CR H483-484)
02/03/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-387.
03/17/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/27/2012Became Public Law No: 112-97. (TXT | PDF)
02/27/2012Signed by President.
02/16/2012HousePresented to President.
02/14/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/13/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S582)
02/07/2012SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
02/06/2012-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/06/2012-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 7 (Roll no. 35). (text: CR H483-484)
02/06/2012-6:55pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H489-490)
02/06/2012-5:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Hastings (WA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
02/06/2012-4:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1162.
02/06/2012-4:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H483-485)
02/06/2012-4:53pmHouseMr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/03/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 265.
02/03/2012HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-387.
10/05/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/05/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/05/2011HouseSubcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
10/05/2011HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
09/15/2011HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
03/25/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/25/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/17/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/17/2011HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E527)
03/17/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/17/2011 Referred to
10/05/2011 Markup by
02/03/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-387
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs03/25/2011 Referred to
10/05/2011 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands03/25/2011 Referred to
09/15/2011 Hearings by
10/05/2011 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1162. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-97 (02/27/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on February 3, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Removes certain federal land within Olympic National Park, Washington, that is designated as part of the Olympic Wilderness from inclusion in the National Wilderness Preservation System.

Takes specified federal land within the Park into trust for the Quileute Indian Tribe.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior to take specified nonfederal land owned by the Tribe into trust for the Tribe, upon completion and acceptance of an environmental hazard assessment.

Includes those lands taken into trust for the Tribe in the Quileute Indian Reservation.

Subjects portions of the federal land conveyed to the Tribe to easements and conditions that preserve the natural condition of the land and provide the public with recreational access to the land and Park.

Exempts land conveyed to the Tribe along the southern boundary of the Reservation from any easements or conditions. Allows that land to be altered to allow for the relocation of Tribe members and structures outside the tsunami and Quillayute River flood zones.

Extinguishes the Tribe's claims against the United States relating to the Park's past or present ownership, entry, use, surveys, or other activities upon the taking of the lands into trust for the Tribe and a formal Tribal Council resolution.

Prohibits gaming on lands taken into trust for the Tribe pursuant to this Act.