Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/17/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/28/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/12/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/04/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/29/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/20/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/20/2012