Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/08/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/13/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/26/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/17/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/20/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/23/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/27/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/16/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/24/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/12/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/10/2012