Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/06/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/12/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/12/2012