Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/01/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/18/2012