Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/05/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/23/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/06/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/06/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/13/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/20/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/13/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/13/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/13/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/13/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/09/2012