Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/25/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/02/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/15/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/21/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/21/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/22/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/22/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/16/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/12/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/18/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/21/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/21/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/21/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/21/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/21/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/21/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/21/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/21/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/21/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/21/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/21/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/21/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/21/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/21/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/21/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/21/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/24/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/24/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/26/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/26/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/31/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/31/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 11/01/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 11/01/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/02/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/02/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 11/10/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/10/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 11/10/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/17/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/23/2012