Text: H.R.1173 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (02/28/2012)

Calendar No. 331

112th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 1173


To repeal the CLASS program.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

February 2, 2012

Received

February 27, 2012

Read the first time

February 28, 2012

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To repeal the CLASS program.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Fiscal Responsibility and Retirement Security Act of 2012”.

SEC. 2. Repeal of CLASS program.

(a) Repeal.—Title XXXII of the Public Health Service Act (42 U.S.C. 300ll et seq.; relating to the CLASS program) is repealed.

(b) Conforming changes.—

(1) (A) Title VIII of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Public Law 111–148; 124 Stat. 119, 846–847) is repealed.

(B) The table of contents contained in section 1(b) of such Act is amended by striking the items relating to title VIII.

(2) Section 1902(a) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1396a(a)) is amended—

(A) by striking paragraphs (81) and (82);

(B) in paragraph (80), by inserting “and” at the end; and

(C) by redesignating paragraph (83) as paragraph (81).

(3) Section 6021(d) of the Deficit Reduction Act of 2005 (42 U.S.C. 1396p note) is amended—

(A) in paragraph (2)(A)(iv)—

(i) by inserting “not” before “include”; and

(ii) by striking “and information” and inserting “or information”; and

(B) in paragraph (3)—

(i) in the heading, by striking “Appropriation” and inserting “Funding”;

(ii) by striking “2015” and inserting “2012”; and

(iii) by adding at the end the following new sentence: “There is authorized to be appropriated to carry out this subsection $3,000,000 for each of fiscal years 2013 through 2015.”.

Passed the House of Representatives February 1, 2012.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 331

112th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 1173

AN ACT
To repeal the CLASS program.

February 28, 2012
Read the second time and placed on the calendar