Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/31/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/31/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/31/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/06/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 04/06/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/06/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/06/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/13/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/13/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/13/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/13/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/15/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/25/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/25/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/25/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/21/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/16/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/29/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/24/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/20/2012