Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/08/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/19/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/15/2011