Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/29/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/30/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/31/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/05/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/13/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/15/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/01/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/20/2012