Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/29/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/30/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/01/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/02/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/05/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/11/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/12/2011