Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/17/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/11/2011