Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/02/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/07/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/01/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/15/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/06/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/16/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/26/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/26/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/17/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/31/2012