Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/17/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/30/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/05/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/11/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/14/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/21/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/07/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/14/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/06/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 10/25/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 10/25/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 11/01/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/14/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/17/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/30/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/13/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/27/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 01/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/27/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/10/2012