Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/17/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/17/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/05/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/05/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/05/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/05/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/05/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/11/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/11/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/11/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/04/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/04/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/12/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/27/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/27/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/27/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/31/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/15/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/22/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/28/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/28/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/12/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/26/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/28/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/29/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/08/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/09/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/13/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 10/13/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/21/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/31/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/10/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/14/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 12/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/09/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 01/18/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/23/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/06/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/26/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/18/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/18/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/27/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/27/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/08/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/29/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/21/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/21/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/02/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/02/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/05/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/19/2012