Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/07/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/19/2012