Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/07/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/03/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/08/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/17/2012