Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/06/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 01/06/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/06/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/06/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 01/06/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/06/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/06/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/12/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 01/12/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/12/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/18/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/18/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/18/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/18/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/18/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/18/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 01/19/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/19/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/20/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/24/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/24/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/24/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/24/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/08/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/17/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/24/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/25/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/21/2012