Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 03/31/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/01/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/06/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2011