Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/15/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 06/01/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/05/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/07/2012