Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/06/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/06/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/06/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/06/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/06/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/06/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/06/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/28/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/14/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/04/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/31/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/05/2012