Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/30/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/30/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/30/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/06/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/06/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/06/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/13/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/13/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/02/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/02/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/02/2011