Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 10/25/2011