Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 03/29/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/30/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/07/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/07/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/04/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/04/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/04/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/04/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/13/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/24/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/24/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/31/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/31/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/01/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/13/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/13/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/13/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/13/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/15/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/23/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/08/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/08/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/08/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/08/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/11/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/21/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/21/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/26/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/05/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/26/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 08/26/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/26/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/09/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/23/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/06/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/01/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/02/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/08/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/08/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/27/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/23/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/09/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/01/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/01/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/24/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/07/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/08/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/11/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/13/2012