Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/21/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/21/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/24/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/25/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/01/2011