Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/26/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/23/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/08/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/15/2011
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/08/2012