Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
09/16/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-29.
09/16/2011 Signed by President.
09/12/2011 Presented to President.
09/08/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 9. Record Vote Number: 129.
06/23/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 304 - 117 (Roll no. 491).
06/01/2011 Committee on The Budget discharged.
06/01/2011 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-98, Part I.
03/30/2011 Introduced in House