There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2011

Short Titles as Reported to House

Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2011

Short Titles as Introduced

Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to place synthetic drugs in Schedule I.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/08/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 317 - 98 (Roll no. 904).(text: CR 12/07/2011 H8238)
11/22/2011Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-295, Part II.
11/22/2011Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 112-295, Part I.
03/30/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
12/08/2011SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
12/08/2011-11:12amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2011-11:12amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 317 - 98 (Roll no. 904). (text: CR 12/07/2011 H8238)
12/08/2011-11:04amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8272-8273)
12/07/2011-6:13pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Pitts objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
12/07/2011-5:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1254.
12/07/2011-5:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8238-8244)
12/07/2011-5:32pmHouseMr. Pitts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/22/2011HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 196.
11/22/2011HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-295, Part II.
11/22/2011HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 112-295, Part I.
11/03/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/03/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/27/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/06/2011HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
07/28/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/28/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/26/2011HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/26/2011HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/21/2011HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
06/01/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/07/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/30/2011HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/30/2011HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/30/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/30/2011 Referred to
07/28/2011 Markup by
11/22/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-295,Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/07/2011 Referred to
07/21/2011 Hearings by
07/26/2011 Markup by
07/26/2011 Reported by
House Judiciary03/30/2011 Referred to
11/03/2011 Markup by
11/22/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-295,Part 2
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/01/2011 Referred to
10/06/2011 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary12/08/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1254. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/08/2011)

Synthetic Drug Control Act of 2011 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to add as schedule I controlled substances: (1) any material, compound, mixture, or preparation which contains specified cannabimimetic agents (or the salts, isomers, or salts of isomers thereof); and (2) specified additional hallucinogenic substances (or the salts, isomers, or salts of isomers thereof).

Extends the period for which the Attorney General may temporarily schedule a substance in schedule I to avoid an imminent hazard to public safety to two years with a one-year extension (currently, one year with a six-month extension).