Committees: H.R.1254 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/30/2011 Referred to
07/28/2011 Markup by
11/22/2011 Reported by House Report 112-295,Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/07/2011 Referred to
07/21/2011 Hearings by
07/26/2011 Markup by
07/26/2011 Reported by
House Judiciary03/30/2011 Referred to
11/03/2011 Markup by
11/22/2011 Reported by House Report 112-295,Part 2
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/01/2011 Referred to
10/06/2011 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary12/08/2011 Referred to