Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/14/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 06/24/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/12/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/06/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/11/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 05/11/2012