There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently extend the 15-year recovery period for qualified leasehold improvement property, qualified restaurant property, and qualified retail improvement property.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/30/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/30/2011Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/30/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (117)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/23/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/24/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/09/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/12/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 10/06/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/06/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/14/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/18/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/08/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/08/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/12/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 12/14/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/23/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/09/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/09/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/09/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/09/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/09/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/14/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/01/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/01/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/01/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/06/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/27/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/24/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/25/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/18/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/06/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/18/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/29/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/25/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/25/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/12/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/12/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/27/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/30/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/18/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/30/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1265. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/30/2011)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the 15-year recovery period classification for qualified leasehold improvement, restaurant, and retail improvement property, for purposes of the depreciation tax deduction.