Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/23/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/24/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/09/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/12/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 10/06/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/06/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/14/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/18/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/08/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/08/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/12/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 12/14/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/23/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/09/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/09/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/09/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/09/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/09/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/14/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/01/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/01/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/01/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/06/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/27/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/24/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/25/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/18/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/06/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/18/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/29/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/25/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/25/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/12/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/12/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/27/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/30/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/18/2012