Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/05/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/05/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 05/05/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/11/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/12/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/12/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/12/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/12/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/25/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/25/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/26/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/23/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/06/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/14/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/18/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/01/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 08/19/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/31/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/12/2012