Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/12/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/12/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/05/2011