Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/02/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/02/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/02/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/05/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/01/2012