Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/02/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/02/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/06/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/02/2012