Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/31/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/24/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/25/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/27/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/29/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/29/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/22/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/01/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/01/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/01/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/19/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/28/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/28/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/12/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/12/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/24/2012