Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/31/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/01/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/01/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/01/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/01/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/01/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/01/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 04/01/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/01/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/01/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/01/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/01/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/01/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/01/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/01/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/01/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/01/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/01/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 04/08/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/08/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/08/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/13/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 04/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/15/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/31/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/31/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/18/2012