Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/31/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/05/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/05/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/13/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 07/06/2011