Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/06/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/07/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/02/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/20/2011