Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/07/2011