Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/29/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/17/2012