Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/31/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/31/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/14/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/02/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/26/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/13/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/13/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/29/2011