There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Sexual and Reproductive Health Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the sexual and reproductive health of individuals and couples in developing countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/01/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/13/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/01/2011Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/01/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/01/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/08/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/07/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/07/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/01/2011 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights05/13/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1319.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1319. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/01/2011)

Global Sexual and Reproductive Health Act of 2011 - Authorizes the President to provide assistance to: (1) support the achievement of universal access to sexual and reproductive health in developing countries and to ensure that individuals and couples can freely and responsibly determine the number, timing, and spacing of their children and have the means to do so; (2) reduce the incidence of unsafe abortion in developing countries and provide care for women experiencing injury or illness from complications of unsafe abortion; (3) ensure that sexual and reproductive health services are provided in developing countries at every phase of a humanitarian emergency; and (4) ensure access to sexual and reproductive health care for young people in developing countries.

Directs the President to implement a strategy to improve and create linkages among the various components of sexual and reproductive health to ensure that individual men and women are provided with a continuum of appropriate sexual and reproductive health services.

States that assistance under this Act shall: (1) promote coordination between and among donors, the private sector, nongovernmental and civil society organizations, and governments in order to support sexual and reproductive health programs in developing countries; and (2) be used for the conduct of formative research and to monitor and evaluate program effectiveness.