Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/01/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/01/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/08/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/07/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/07/2012