Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/06/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/07/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/07/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/12/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/13/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/13/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/15/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/15/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/04/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew