Text: H.R.1323 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/01/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1323


To require the President to recommend specific reductions in nonsecurity discretionary appropriations for fiscal year 2011 to offset the costs of military operations in Libya.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

April 1, 2011

Mr. Bartlett (for himself, Mr. Harris, Mr. Jones, Mr. Kucinich, Mr. Paul, and Mr. McKeon) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To require the President to recommend specific reductions in nonsecurity discretionary appropriations for fiscal year 2011 to offset the costs of military operations in Libya.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Protect America from U.S. Military Expenses in Libya Act of 2011”.

SEC. 2. Reductions in FY2011 nonsecurity funding to offset costs of military operations in Libya.

(a) Submission of recommendations.—Not later than July 1, 2011, to ensure that the cost of military operations in Libya does not increase the Federal deficit or reduce the capability of the United States Armed Forces, the President shall submit to the Congress a list of recommendations for specific rescissions of nonsecurity discretionary appropriations for fiscal year 2011, for reappropriation to accounts of the Department of Defense to replace the amounts obligated for such operations for such fiscal year.

(b) Minimum aggregate amount of recommended rescissions.—The aggregate amount of the rescissions recommended under subsection (a) shall be not less than the projected cost determined under subsection (c).

(c) Projection of cost of military operations.—Not later than June 1, 2011, the Secretary of Defense shall determine and submit to the Congress and the President a report containing the projected cost to the United States of military operations in Libya for fiscal year 2011, based on the cost of such operations through May 15, 2011.

(d) Definitions.—In this section:

(1) The term “nonsecurity discretionary appropriations” means discretionary appropriations other than appropriations made available for an account, program, project, or activity of the Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, or Department of Veterans Affairs.

(2) The term “military operations in Libya” includes the military operations in Libya designated by the United States as Operation Odyssey Dawn and by the North Atlantic Treaty Organization as Operation Unified Protector.