Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/13/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/16/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/16/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/16/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/07/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/13/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/13/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/12/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/25/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/27/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 07/18/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/27/2012